Johnson et al v. Executive Protective Agency K-9 & Investigative Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Charlie Johnson and Bessie Johnson
Defendant: Franklin R. Whiteley, Executive Protective Agency K-9 & Investigative Services, Inc., Park Crest Apartments and Does 6-100
Case Number: 3:2007cv00570
Filed: March 28, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2011 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Defendants Brian Sullivan and Luis Laras Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs fifth cause of action for assault and battery is DISMISSED. Denying 113 Defendants Motion to Strike as moot. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/17/2011. (amh)
September 28, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 63 Motion to Dismiss, 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 75 Motion to Dismiss, 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 76 Motion for Summary Judgment, 77 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 86 Motion for Leave to File Proposed Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 09/28/09. (bjb) (jrl).
July 29, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating Pretrial Conference. The Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/09 is hereby vacated; The Court will reschedule the Pretrial Conference after it has ruled on the pending motions.. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 7/29/09. (ksr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Executive Protective Agency K-9 & Investigative Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin R. Whiteley
Represented By: Douglas John Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Protective Agency K-9 & Investigative Services, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas John Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Crest Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 6-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Johnson
Represented By: Robert Hamparyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Johnson
Represented By: Robert Hamparyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?