Payne et al v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Steve Bartilucci and Robert Payne
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Company, DOES 1 through 50, Safeway, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc. and Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00705
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2007 48 Case transferred to District of New Jersey pursuant to MDL 1850.(bar)
July 2, 2007 47 NOTICE by Menu Foods, Inc. re 6 Notice (Other) OF MULTIDISTRICT CONSOLIDATION PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1407 AND REQUEST TO MAINTAIN STAY (Hack, Susan)
June 22, 2007 46 Featured Case ORDER denying 44 Joint Motion for Extension of time to file responsive pleading without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/22/07. (jpp)
June 11, 2007 45 Featured Case ORDER denying 42 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadingwithout prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/08/07. (jpp, )
June 11, 2007 44 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Menu Foods, Inc.. (Hack, Susan)
June 8, 2007 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Defendant Menu Foods Inc's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/08/07. (jpp, )
June 8, 2007 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading by The Proctor & Gamble Company. (Howarth, Don)
June 5, 2007 41 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff Steven Bartilucci's motion to substitute in as Attorney of record Rene L. Barge and Katherine J. Odenbreit of Class Action litigation group as his attorney of record. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/05/07. (jpp, )
June 5, 2007 40 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff Robert Payne's Motion to Substitute in as Attorney of record Rene L. Barge and Katherine J. Odenbreit of Class Action litigation group as his attoney of record.Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/05/07. (jpp, )
June 4, 2007 39 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Stay re 6 Notice (Other) filed by Menu Foods, Inc.. (Hack, Susan)
June 1, 2007 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Stay re 6 Notice (Other) by Menu Foods filed by Robert Payne. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
June 1, 2007 37 DECLARATION re 36 Objection to Menu Foods' Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff Robert Payne. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
June 1, 2007 36 OBJECTION by Robert Payne to Def Menu Foods Motion to Stay Case (Odenbreit, Katherine)
May 30, 2007 35 Third Party MOTION for Order re Substitution of Attorney by Robert Payne. (Odenbreit, Katherine) (jpp, ).
May 30, 2007 34 Third Party MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rene L. Barge and Katherine J. Odenbreit by Robert Payne. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
May 30, 2007 33 Third Party MOTION for Order re: Substitition of Attorney by Steve Bartilucci. (Odenbreit, Katherine) (jpp,).
May 30, 2007 32 Third Party MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rene L. Barge and Katherine J. Odenbreit by Steve Bartilucci. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
May 29, 2007 31 NOTICE by Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. JOINDER IN MENU FOODS' MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (Rovens, Douglas)
May 23, 2007 30 Featured Case ORDER vacating hearing date of 05/31/07 for defendants motion to stay. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/23/07. (jpp, )
May 23, 2007 29 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: D Jeffrey Ireland appearing for Defendant The Proctor & Gamble Company. Signed by Judge John A. Housto on 05/23/07. (jpp, )
May 21, 2007 28 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Brian D Wright appearing for Defendant The Proctor & Gamble Company. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/17/07. (jpp, )
May 21, 2007 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant The Procter & Gamble Complany's First Responsive pleading is due on or before 06/11/07. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/18/07. (jpp, )
May 18, 2007 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by The Proctor & Gamble Company. (Howarth, Don)
May 15, 2007 25 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Priya Jesani appearing for Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. (jpp, )
May 15, 2007 24 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Michael P Turiello appearing for Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. (jpp, )
May 15, 2007 23 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Edward B Ruff, III appearing for Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. (jpp, )
May 14, 2007 22 NOTICE of Joinder by The Proctor & Gamble Company To Defendant Menu Foods, Inc.'s Motion To Stay All Proceedings (Howarth, Don)
May 14, 2007 21 NOTICE by Menu Foods, Inc. DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Hack, Susan)
May 9, 2007 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Proctor & Gamble Company. (Howarth, Don)
May 7, 2007 19 Letter from atty Milberg Weiss re MDL 1850 (bar, )
May 7, 2007 18 NOTICE before the Judicial Panel re MDL 1850 - Plaintiffs' notice of joinder and joinder in motion for transfer of actions to the Central District of CA and for consolidated or coordinated pretrial preceedings pursuant to 28USC1407 (bar, )
May 2, 2007 17 NOTICE of Appearance re MDL 1850 before the Judicial Panel (Attachments: # 1 Notice Motion re transfer of action# 2 Memo of Points and Authorities)(bar, )
May 1, 2007 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/30/07. (jpp, )
April 30, 2007 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Menu Foods, Inc.. (Hack, Susan)
April 27, 2007 14 Discrepancy Order by Judge John A. Houston rejecting document: Joint Motion for Extension of Time 13 from Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. filed by Susan Hack. Non-compliance with local rule ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judge's signature. The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/27/07. (jpp, )
April 27, 2007 13 STRIKEN PER ORDER 14 . Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to File Responsive Pleading and Proof of Service by Menu Foods, Inc.. (Hack, Susan)
April 27, 2007 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading. The Proctor & Gamble Company answer due 5/29/2007. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/26/07. (jcj)
April 27, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER Granting 10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. answer due 5/29/2007. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/27/07. (jcj)
April 26, 2007 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.. (Segal, Richard)
April 25, 2007 9 NOTICE of Joinder by The Proctor & Gamble Company In Notice of Removal of Action (Howarth, Don)
April 25, 2007 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading by The Proctor & Gamble Company. (Howarth, Don)
April 23, 2007 7 MOTION to Stay re 6 Notice (Other) by Menu Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits# 2 Proof of Service)(Hack, Susan)
April 23, 2007 6 NOTICE by Menu Foods, Inc. TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS (Hack, Susan)
April 23, 2007 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Menu Foods, Inc. re 4 Notice (Other) (Hack, Susan)
April 20, 2007 4 NOTICE by Menu Foods, Inc. of related case(s) 07-00706 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hack, Susan) Modified on 04/23/07 to reflect (Low number order prepared 04/23/07 by vet) (jpp).
April 18, 2007 3 NOTICE of Lodgment of State Court file, by Menu Foods, Inc. (jpp, )
April 18, 2007 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Menu Foods, Inc. (jpp, )
April 18, 2007 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL t/w Complaint and Jury Demand, from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2007-00064159-CU-PL-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt #137267), filed by Menu Foods, Inc.(jcj) (bar, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne et al v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Company
Represented By: Don Howarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Turiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Mark Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Bartilucci
Represented By: Eric Benink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Payne
Represented By: Eric Benink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?