Ollier et al v. Sweetwater Union High School District et al

Plaintiff: Veronica Ollier, Naudia Rangel, Maritza Rangel, Amanda Hernandez and Arianna Hernandez
Defendant: Sweetwater Union High School District, Arlie N Ricasa, Pearl Quinones, Jim Cartmill, Jaime Mercado, Greg R Sandoval, Jesus M Gandara, Earl Weins and Russell Moore
Case Number: 3:2007cv00714
Filed: April 19, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 225 Motion to Enforce Permanent Injunction and Setting Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Held in Contempt. The statement of cause shall be filed on or before March 31, 2014. Plaintiffs may file a response to defendants statement of cause on or before April 14, 2014. A hearing may be scheduled on the contempt issue after briefing has concluded and at the Courts discretion. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/17/2014. (sjt)
June 21, 2012 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 197 Motion for More Amended, Additional or New Findings. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/21/2012. (mtb)
February 9, 2012 193 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. The parties shall submit the proposed compliance plan within 45 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/9/2012.(mtb)
November 30, 2010 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 183 Motion to Strike Trial Testimony Concerning Connect-Ed Phone System. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/30/10. (lmt)
August 23, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 125 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Retaliation Claim: IT IS ORDERED defendants motion to strike plaintiffs third cause of action for retaliation or alternatively to exclude evidence of retaliation is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/23/2010. (mjj)
July 29, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 140 Ex Parte Motion to Bifurcate Trial Conditioned on Waiver of a Second Trial. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/29/2010. (mjj)
July 12, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 138 Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Claim for Relief: Because notice to class members is required when a voluntary dismissal of a claim is proposed, the parties joint motion to dismiss plaintiffs fourth claim for relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/12/2010. (mjj)
April 26, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 111 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony; and Granting 126 MOTION to Exclude 38 Witnesses: IT IS ORDERED: 1. GRANTING plaintiffs motion to exclude the expert testimony of Peter Schiff and Penny Parker; and 2. GRANTING plaintiffs motion to exclude witnesses not previously disclosed. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/26/2010.(mjj) (jrl).
April 15, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 107 Motion for Advisory Jury. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/15/2010. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ollier et al v. Sweetwater Union High School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Ollier
Represented By: Elizabeth Kristen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naudia Rangel
Represented By: Elizabeth Kristen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Rangel
Represented By: Elizabeth Kristen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth Kristen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianna Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth Kristen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater Union High School District
Represented By: Gil Abed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlie N Ricasa
Represented By: Gil Abed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl Quinones
Represented By: Gil Abed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Cartmill
Represented By: Gil Abed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Mercado
Represented By: Gil Abed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg R Sandoval
Represented By: Gil Abed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus M Gandara
Represented By: Gil Abed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Weins
Represented By: Gil Abed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Moore
Represented By: Gil Abed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?