Ford et al v. Menu Foods Income Fund et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Hayley Ford and Shannon J. Kramer
Defendant: Kroger Co., Petsmart, Fry's Food Centers, Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., The Iams Company, Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Smith's Food and Drug Centers, Inc., Nutro Products, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Chemnutra, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Del Monte Foods Company, Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc. and Petco Southwest, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00734
Filed: April 23, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2007 10
Case transferred to District of New Jersey pursuant to MDL 1850. (bar)
July 9, 2007 9
REPLY re 8 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Menu Food's Notice of Multidistrict Consolidation and Request to Maintain Stay filed by Hayley Ford. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
July 3, 2007 8
NOTICE of Multidistrict Consolidation pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and request to maintain stay, by Menu Foods, Inc. (jpp)
May 15, 2007 7
NOTICE by Hayley Ford Response to MDL Panel re Del Monte Motion for Illinois Venue (Odenbreit, Katherine)
May 9, 2007 5
Rule 5.3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Del Monte Foods Company. (bar, )
May 4, 2007 4
MOTION to Consolidate Cases pending motions for transfer and consolidation of actions by Del Monte Foods Company. (Rodriguez, Steven) Modified on 5/7/2007 to terminate per ct, E-filing is a Notice re MDL (jpp, ).
May 1, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER of transfer pursuant to Low-Number Rule. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston and Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz, Ruben B. Brooks no longer assigned to case. New Case Number is 07CV0734-JAH(CAB).. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 04/30/07. (jpp, )
April 23, 2007 2
Summons Issued as to Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Del Monte Foods Company, Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Hills Pet Nutrition, Nutro Products, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petco Southwest, Inc., Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc., The Iams Company, Fry's Food Centers, Smith's Food and Drug Centers, Inc., Kroger Co., Chemnutra, Inc., Petsmart (jcj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford et al v. Menu Foods Income Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petsmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry's Food Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Iams Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food and Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutro Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemnutra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Monte Foods Company
Represented By: Steven L Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Purina Petcare Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Southwest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayley Ford
Represented By: Katherine J Odenbreit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon J. Kramer
Represented By: Katherine J Odenbreit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?