Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Charter Connection Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: Belle Amie ON 1170780, Charter Connection Corporation, Peter Terrebonne and Pamela Terrebonne
Case Number: 3:2007cv00767
Filed: April 26, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2008 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 112 Motion for Credit Bid Authority and for Award of Additional Costs; and Denying as Moot 118 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time: Caterpillars request for credit bid authority at the sale is granted. Cater pillars request for custodia legis expenses accrued since November 30, 2007 is denied without prejudice. Caterpillar shall promptly after the sale and confirmation file with the court a motion, supporting evidence, and a proposed order, which shall reflect Caterpillars custodia legis expenses accrued since November 30, 2007. Caterpillars ex parte application for an order to shorten time is denied as moot. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/5/2008. (mjj)
May 4, 2007 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1)Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend (2) Vacating Order Authorizing Issuance of Arrest Warrant; and (3) Recalling Vessel Arrest Warrant: The complaint is Dismissed with leave to amend, the Order Authorizing Issuance of Warrant for Arrest is Vacated, and the in rem warrant for vessel arrest issued May 1, 2007 is herby Recalled. Any amended complaint must be filed no later than 30 days after this order is stamped "Filed". Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/4/2007. (mjj, )(mam). Modified on 5/8/2007 to add dismissing text (mjj, ).
May 3, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Ex Parte Motion for Order Appointing Substitute Custodian: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Order Appointing Substitute Custodian and Order Authorizing Movement and Inspection of Defendant Vessel is Denied Without Prejudice to refiling it with the requisite support. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/3/2007. (mjj, )(mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Charter Connection Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belle Amie ON 1170780
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Connection Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Terrebonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Terrebonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Michael A Barcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?