Tobar et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Oswaldo Enrique Tobar, Rosa Carmelina Zambrano Lucas, Junior Ivan Pico Alava, Segundo Matias Zambrano Alonzo, Francisco Gabriel Yole Arteago, Fausto Lupercio Arias Castaneda, Frabricio Bayron Cedeno, Joffre Johnny Cedeno Cedeno, Lindon Cleofe Cedeno Cedeno, Ramon Eliades Ramon Velez Cedeno, Daniel David Quimi Chalen, Pablo Eduardo Lucas Conforme, Ramon Eduardo Pilligua Conforme, Ciro Mariano Lopez Mero, Pedro Manuel Lopez Mero, Jose Eduardo Lucas Mero, Luis Antonio Penafiel Mero, Pedro Jose Reyes Mero, Telmo Arcadio Chica Obando, Luis Miguel Cedeno Pico, Jaime Gustavo Palma Pinargote, Yardy Klever Flores Segovia, Pacho Hernandez Solorzano, Carlos Wilfrido Veliz Velez, Jose Luis Zambrano Zambrano and Carlos Orlando Velez Zambrano
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2007cv00817
Filed: May 4, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2016 244 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: Plaintiffs' Emergency Rule 37 and Rule 26(b) Motion or in the Alternative Plaintiffs' Motion for a Continuance is denied. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiffs as to all claims in the Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/5/2016. (mdc)
October 30, 2015 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing re 207 Emergency Rule 37 And Rule 26(b) Motion or in the Alternative Motion for a Continuance. Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/11/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 14B before Judge William Q. Hayes. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/30/2015.(srm)
August 4, 2015 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion in Limine (Dkt # 199 ) is granted. Evidence of damages at trial shall be limited to the claims of Plaintiffs Tobar and Lucas. Plaintiffs' "Motion" in Limine (Dkt # 198 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/4/2015. (mdc)
September 25, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion For Protective Orders And Motion To Quash Notices Of Depositions (Re Doc. 147 ): Defendant United States is granted leave to re-notice these two depositions to proceed in San Diego. Any independent medical examinations of these two plaintiffs should be conducted in coordination with the depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/25/2014. (mdc)
March 28, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable David H. Bartick, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates set before Magist rate Judge Bartick, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 07cv817 WQH (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 03/28/14.(jcj)
June 13, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs failed to establish subject matter jurisdiction under the Public Vessels Act because the discretionary function exception applies retaining sovereign immunity for the United States. The Public Vessels Act i s not a valid basis for subject matter jurisdiction because reciprocity does not exist with Ecuador which is a jurisdictional prerequisite to the waiver of sovereign immunity under the Public Vessels Act. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/13/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobar et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oswaldo Enrique Tobar
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Carmelina Zambrano Lucas
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Ivan Pico Alava
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segundo Matias Zambrano Alonzo
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Gabriel Yole Arteago
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fausto Lupercio Arias Castaneda
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frabricio Bayron Cedeno
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joffre Johnny Cedeno Cedeno
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindon Cleofe Cedeno Cedeno
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Eliades Ramon Velez Cedeno
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel David Quimi Chalen
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Eduardo Lucas Conforme
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Eduardo Pilligua Conforme
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciro Mariano Lopez Mero
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Manuel Lopez Mero
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Eduardo Lucas Mero
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Antonio Penafiel Mero
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Jose Reyes Mero
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telmo Arcadio Chica Obando
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Miguel Cedeno Pico
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Gustavo Palma Pinargote
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yardy Klever Flores Segovia
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacho Hernandez Solorzano
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Wilfrido Veliz Velez
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Zambrano Zambrano
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Orlando Velez Zambrano
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: John Seely Luce, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?