Lister v. Clay et al

Petitioner: Abner H Lister
Respondent: Jerry Brown and I D Clay
Case Number: 3:2007cv00822
Filed: June 4, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Tuolumne
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Certificate of Appealability. In this case, the Court finds that reasonable jurists would not find it debatable that Petitioner was denied a constitutional right, nor could a court resolve the issues in a different manner. The questions are also not adequate to deserve encouragement to proceed further. Accordingly, the Court DENIES a certificate of appealability as to all of Petitioner's claims. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/18/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (akr)
March 6, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court ADOPTS the 14 Report and Recommendation in its entirety and DENIES WITH PREJUDICE Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/6/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(asw)(kaj).
June 21, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER confirming Petitioner's abandonment of grounds three and four of the petition, and requiring response. Any motion to dismiss ddl set for 08/31/07. Any opposition to dismiss ddl set for 10/01/07. Answer ddl set for 09/28/07. Traverse ddl set for 10/29/07. Signed by Judge Jan M. Adler on 06/21/07. (joeh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lister v. Clay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: I D Clay
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abner H Lister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?