Mat-Van Inc et al v. Sheldon Good and Company Auctions LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mat-Van Inc, Luman N Nevels, Jr and IDB Corporate Retreat
Defendant: DOES, Sheldon Good and Company Auctions and Sheldon Good and Company Auctions LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv00912
Filed: May 21, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/20/2009. Entire action and all claims are dismissed w/ prejudice. Each party to bear their own attys' fees and costs. Case closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)
January 5, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 50 Motion to File a Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/5/2009. Plaintiffs may assert a breach of fiduciary duty claim and may amend their fraud claim so long as the specified language rega rding promises in paragraphs 9 (A), (C), (D) and (F) is eliminated. Court orders the proposed Third Amended Complaint's breach of contract cause of action be amended to comply w/ Court's 2/8/2008 Dismissal Order. Court orders that the Third Amended Complaint's caption reflect the dismissal of Dft Sheldon Good and Company Auctions. Third Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than 10 days from the date of this Order. Court will consider no further amendments to the Complaint. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah). Modified on 1/6/2009 - Edited text (jah).
February 6, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Dfts' 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/6/2008. Dft Sheldon Goods & Company Auctions is dismissed from case. This partial dismissal is w/ prejudice. Court denies Dft's 26 Motion to Strike Request for Punitive Damages and denies Dfts' 28 Request for Judicial Notice. Dft ordered to file an answer w/in twenty (2) days of the date this Order. (jah)
July 27, 2007 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dfts' 9 Motion to Dismiss; Denying as moot Dfts' 9 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/27/2007. Court grants Plaintiffs leave to amend the Complaint. Pla may file an Amended Complaint no later than 14 days from the date this Order is filed. Case is terminated. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mat-Van Inc et al v. Sheldon Good and Company Auctions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Good and Company Auctions
Represented By: David Arthur Belofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Good and Company Auctions LLC
Represented By: David Arthur Belofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mat-Van Inc
Represented By: Harris I Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luman N Nevels, Jr
Represented By: Harris I Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDB Corporate Retreat
Represented By: Harris I Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?