Colliard v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: John Colliard
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc. and Chemnutra, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00951
Filed: May 24, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2007 8
Case transferred to District of New Jersey pursuant to MDL 1850.(bar)
July 25, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Report of Clerk and Order of Transfer pursuant to "Low-Number" Rule. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston and Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. Judge Irma E. Gonzalez, Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez and Judge John A. Houston on 07/23/07. New Case # 07CV0951-JAH(CAB).(jpp)
July 16, 2007 5
NOTICE by Menu Foods, Inc. OF RELATED CASES, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 40.1(e) (Hack, Susan) Modified on 7/17/2007 to reflect Low Number Order prepared. (jpp, ).
July 13, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting request to maintain stay. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 07/12/07. (jpp)
July 3, 2007 3
NOTICE of Multidistrict Consolidation and Request to Maintain Stay by Menu Foods, Inc. (jah)
May 25, 2007 2
Summons Issued as to Menu Foods, Inc., Chemnutra, Inc.. (jah)
May 24, 2007 1
COMPLAINT t/w Jury Demand against Menu Foods, Inc., Chemnutra, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt #138588), filed by John Colliard.(jcj) (mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colliard v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Colliard
Represented By: Harold M Hewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Moriarty Hack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemnutra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?