Williams v. Walker et al

Petitioner: Benny Williams
Respondent: J Walker and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2007cv00959
Filed: June 4, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying Rule 60(b) Motion for Relief from Judgment (ECF No. 93 ), and (2) Declining to Issue a Certificate of Appealability. The Court Denies Petitioner's Rule 60(b) motion for relief from judgment. The denial is without prejudice t o Petitioner to file a second or successive petition in this Court if he obtains permission from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. The Court Declines to issue a certificate of appealability with respect to the denial of Petitioners Rule 60(b) Motion. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/5/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu) (sjt).
November 18, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Adopting in part and declining to adopt in part the findings and conclusions of United States Magistrate Judge [Doc. No. 61]; (2) Denying first amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus [Doc. No. 37]; and, (3) Issuing a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/18/09. (vet) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). Modified on 11/19/2009 - to note all non-registered users served (vet).(av1).
February 5, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Petition re 37 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Benny Williams. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2009 Replies due by 3/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/5/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benny Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J Walker
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?