McCurdy v. General Dynamics National Steel and Shipbuilding

Plaintiff: Sean McCurdy
Defendant: General Dynamics National Steel and Shipbuilding (NASSCO) and Does 1 through 20
Miscellaneous_party: USA
Case Number: 3:2007cv00982
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 41 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/31/2010. (jer)
April 20, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss as Moot; Granting leave to file First Amended Complaint; Ordering Clerk to Seal 31 First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall serve the First Amended Complaint on the government, and the government shall notify the Court within forty-five days of service whether it elects to intervene based on the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/20/10. (lao)
February 4, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing hearing on defendant's Motion to dismiss 26 to April 2, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/3/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
August 6, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to Unseal Case. It is ordered that the Complaint 1 to be unsealed and served upon the Dfts by the Relator. All other contents of Court's file shall remain under seal and not to be made public or served upon the Dfts, except for this Orde r and 20 Govt's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention. Seal to be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. Parties shall serve all pleadings and motions upon the USA. USA may order any depositi on transcripts and is entitled to intervene at any time. Should Relator or the Dfts propose that this action be dismissed, settled or discontinued, the parties will provide the United States w/ notice and the United States will have an opportunity to be heard before ruling or granting its approval. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/6/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (Rec'd in Docketing 8/12/2009) (jah). Modified on 8/12/2009 - Generated NEF (jah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCurdy v. General Dynamics National Steel and Shipbuilding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean McCurdy
Represented By: Guillermo Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous_party: USA
Represented By: Joseph J Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics National Steel and Shipbuilding (NASSCO)
Represented By: Rick Lloyd Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?