Munguia v. Frias et al

Plaintiff: Jesus Lopez Munguia
Defendant: J Frias, D Pollard, G Siota, R Sutton, A Lopez and W Griggs
Case Number: 3:2007cv01016
Filed: June 4, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Doc. 84 ) Plaintiff's Motion to Rebuttal Defendant's Expert Witness Designation; Denying (Doc. 85 ) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/20/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cap)
October 23, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion to Refer this case to Magistrate Judge Battaglia for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 10/19/09. All dates pending before this court is vacated. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ksr) (jrl).
September 24, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING [16[ REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(llb)
August 12, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 08/12/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(bjb) (av1).
January 27, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 57 MOTION to Dismiss. This Court RECOMMENDS that Defendants motion to dismiss be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Recommending: Excessive force claim against Frias & Pollard be DENIED; Griggs, Sutton & Siota motion to dismiss be GRANTED; Claims of indifference to medical needs; implementing, maintaining and tolerating deficient policies, practices & customs; and class-based animus be DISMISSED. Lopez claims re excessive force and due process violation be DISMIS SED. Frias, Pollard & Lopez motion to dismiss retaliation claim be DISMISSED. Claim for injunctive relief be GRANTED and DISMISSED and motion to dismiss on 11th Amendment grounds be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2009. Replies due by 3/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/27/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (asw) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munguia v. Frias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Lopez Munguia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Frias
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Pollard
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Siota
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Sutton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Lopez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Griggs
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?