Jones v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Rodney Wayne Jones
Defendant: J O Flores, Stuart J Ryan, T Ochoa, R Pegues, M A Jimenez, R L Torres, P S Zills, K E Schommer, J A Ortiz, C G Rodiles, N A Mejia, M Sandoval, J A Wells, F Castaneda, R Baily, S A Cosio, S Ritter and D Bell
Case Number: 3:2007cv01019
Filed: June 4, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 178 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/6/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
January 24, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' partial Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.56. re 130 , 131 . Because there are no remaining claims against Defendants Pegues, Baily, Cosio, Ritter, Harmon, Duarte, Price, Martinez, Valenzuela and Rangel, and there is no just reason for delay, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter a final judgment as to these Defendants pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 54(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 1/24/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
June 3, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 137 ) Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Compel. All further responses and production of documents required by this Order shall be served by no later than June 30, 2010. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is June 7, 2 010. A hearing on (Doc. 130 ) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is scheduled for August 20, 2010. Plaintiff's Opposition must be filed by August 6, 2010. Defendants Reply to that Opposition must be filed by August 13, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 6/3/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cap)
December 15, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 111 Motion for Relief From Court's June 26, 2009 Order Pursuant to FED.R.CIV. P. 60(b). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/15/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet) (jrl).
October 30, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 111 MOTION filed by Rodney Wayne Jones, (Opposition Brief by Defendant due 11/13/2009, Reply by Plaintiffs due 11/20/2009). Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 10/30/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ksr) Modified on 10/30/2009 (ksr).
July 10, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Telephonic Case Management Conference, ( Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom D before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler.) Plaintiff and Counsel for Defendants shall appear telephonically at this conference.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 7/10/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ksr)
June 26, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Dismiss; Dismissing the Defendants Torres and Bailey Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(m) and orders remaining defendants to file their Answer to the claims remaining in the Plaintiff's First Ameded Complaint within ten (10) days of the date this order is 'Filed' pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P12(a)(4)(A). Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 06/26/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(bjb) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J O Flores
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart J Ryan
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ochoa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Pegues
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M A Jimenez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R L Torres
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P S Zills
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K E Schommer
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J A Ortiz
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C G Rodiles
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N A Mejia
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Sandoval
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J A Wells
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Castaneda
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Baily
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S A Cosio
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Ritter
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Bell
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?