Wildey v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Luisa C Wildey
Defendant: State Of California, Rehabilitation Appeals Board, Department of Rehabilitation, Client Assistance Program, The Dayle McIntosh Center for the Disabled, The Access Center of San Diego, Inc., Sharp Memorial Hospital, Workers' Compensation Appeals Board and Bureau of Rehabilitation
Case Number: 3:2007cv01154
Filed: August 28, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court grants summary judgment in favor of Access and against Plaintiff, denies Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time, and denies Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter final judgment and to close the file.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
March 19, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/18/2010. The court grants Sharp's converted summary judgment motion in its entirety and grants DOR and DIR's motion for summary judgment in its entirety. Finally, the court notes that the only remaining defendant who has been served with the summons and complaint and appeared in this action is defendant Access to Independence. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
September 14, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/11/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
September 9, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motions to Dismiss as moot 44 and 46 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/9/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)(jrl).
February 2, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/2/09. The court grants the motion to dismiss, grants the motion to strike 35 and grants Plaintiffleave to amend. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
August 28, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/24/07. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wildey v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa C Wildey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehabilitation Appeals Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Client Assistance Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dayle McIntosh Center for the Disabled
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Access Center of San Diego, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workers' Compensation Appeals Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?