Lona v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Roberta Lona
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2007cv01276
Filed: July 13, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Court's 38 Memorandum of Decision and Order issued on 3/24/2009 is vacated. Case dismissed in its entirety w/ prejudice. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/2/2009. (jah)
March 25, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PER 6/2/2009 ORDER VACATING MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER AND DISMISSING ACTION 47 - CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Roberta Lona against The Prudential Insurance Company of Ameri ca. Pla shall recover $90,416.06 for past benefits from 2/1/2006 to 3/31/2009 plus prejudgment interest at rate applicable to each benefit payment pursuant to FRCP 28 USC 1961(a). Court orders that pla shall file request for attys' fees and costs pursuant to FRCP 54(d) and Civil Local Rule 54.1, and that Prudential shall reinstate pla under the Policy, effective 1/1/2006. The parties' rights and duties are reinstated consistent w/ the terms and conditions of the Policy. Case closed. (jah) (av1). Modified on 6/2/2009 - Edited to reflect as vacated (jah).
March 24, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PER 6/2/2009 ORDER 47 - MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER. Judgment is entered in favor of pla. Pla shall recover $90,416.06 for past benefits from 2/1/2006 to 3/31/2009 plus prejudgment interest at rate applicable to each benefit payme nt pursuant to 28 USC 1961(a). Court orders that: 1.) pla shall file request for atty's fees and costs pursuant to FRCP 54(d) and Local Rule 54.1, 2.) Prudential shall reinstate pla under the Policy, effective 1/1/2006. Parties' rights and duties are reinstated consistent w/ terms and conditions of the Policy. Clerk shall enter judgment consistent w/ this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/24/2009. Case closed. (jah) (av1). Modified on 6/2/2009 - Edited to reflect as vacated (jah).
January 5, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Prudential Insurance Company's 25 Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Plaintiff at Trial. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/5/2009. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lona v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Lona
Represented By: John W Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Sean P Nalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?