Sua v. Woodford

Petitioner: Michael Raymond Sua
Respondent: Jeanne S Woodford
Case Number: 3:2007cv01338
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the Court adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety, denies the second Motion for Reconsideration, and denies the First Amended Petition. The Court also denies a Certificate of Appealability (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
November 4, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and the court denies the Request for Stay and Abeyance. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/4/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
March 8, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to for stay without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sua v. Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Raymond Sua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeanne S Woodford
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?