Pride v. Correa et al

Plaintiff: David Codell Pride, JR
Defendant: M Correa, Levin, T Ochoa and John or Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2007cv01382
Filed: September 21, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 124 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/12/2014. (knb)
April 28, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 5/12/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/28/2014.(knb)
September 10, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 97 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel. Appointed Johanna S. Schiavoni for David Codell Pride, JR. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/6/2013. (cc: Johanna S. Schiavoni)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
May 27, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Defendants' 62 Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.56(c); and (2) Denying Plaintiff's 77 Motion to Dismiss Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court further Certifies that an IFP appeal from this Order would be frivolous and, therefore, would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/27/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
April 21, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 72 Request for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall have until Friday, May 7, 2010, to file his Opposition and Defendants shall have until Friday, May 14,2010, to file a Reply. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be considered submitted as of Friday, May 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/21/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
September 21, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Directing US Marshal to effect service. IFP prepared.. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 09/21/07. (joeh)
August 6, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (1) Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed IFP [Doc. No. 2] is DENIED.(2) This action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prepay the $350 filing fee mandated by 28 U.S.C. § 1914(a), and for failure to successfully mov e to proceed IFP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a).(3) Plaintiff if GRANTED forty five (45) days from the date this Order is Filed to either: (1) pay the entire $350 filing fee, or (2) file a new Motion to Proceed IFP, which includes a certif ied copy of his trust account statement for the 6-month period preceding thefiling of his Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(2) and S.D. CAL. CIVLR 3.2(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide Plaintiff with a C ourt-approved form Motion and Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed IFP in this matter. If Plaintiff neither pays the $350 filing fee in full nor sufficiently completes and files the attached Motion to Proceed IFP, together with a certifie d copy of his prison trust account statement within 45 days, this action shall remained closed without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 08/06/07. (Motion and Delclaration in support of motion to proceed IPF and a copy of this order sent to petitioner.)(joeh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pride v. Correa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Codell Pride, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Correa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levin
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ochoa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?