Quinones v. Mulculsulban

Plaintiff: Maria Quinones
Defendant: USA, Officer Mulculsulban and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv01565
Filed: August 8, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 joint Motion for Extension of Time to conduct limited discovery for the deposition of Lisa Hudec. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/15/09. (tkl) (jrl).
May 15, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file the proposed second amended complaint attached to their motion as Exhibit 1 and denying 29 Plaintiff's prior motion for leave to amend as moot. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/15/09. (tkl) (jrl).
January 5, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/5/2009. Court grants Pla an additional thirty (30) days to name Doe Defendants and file a Second Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint shall be filed by 1/28/2009. All other dates remain as previously set. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones v. Mulculsulban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Mulculsulban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Quinones
Represented By: Eugene G Iredale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?