Veoh Networks, Inc. v. UMG Recordings, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Veoh Networks, Inc. is a video hosting service that provides a mechanism for third parties to share video on the Internet. Plaintiff seeks a declaratory judgment that (1) it has no liability to defendants for the unsolicited posting of content on the Veoh website; (2) it is not liable for direct, contributory or vicarious infringement of defendants\' copyrights; (3) it is not liable for inducing the infringement of any of defendants\' copyrights; (4) defendants are not entitled to any injunctions against plaintiff; and (5) it is entitled to safe harbor pursuant to 17 USC § 512(c).

Plaintiff: Veoh Networks, Inc.
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal , Inc., DOES and Universal Music Corp.
Case Number: 3:2007cv01568
Filed: August 9, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2007 29
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court grants Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer and dismisses Plaintiff's case without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is in favor of Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc. against Veoh Networks, Inc. (aje)
November 14, 2007 28 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer; Order granting 23 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply; and Order granting 13 Motion to Dismiss or transfer, and dismissing Plaintiff's case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/13/07. (aje)
October 25, 2007 26
NOTICE by UMG Recordings, Inc. re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer, of Central District Order (Glatstein, Benjamin) (kmm ).
October 12, 2007 25
RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Voeh's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Tranfer filed by UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., DOES. (Brown, Elliot) Modified on 10/15/2007 to edit text (aje).
September 28, 2007 20
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, Transfer by UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., DOES. (Glatstein, Benjamin) Modified on 10/31/07, notified atty document does not contain proper electronic signature (aje).
September 26, 2007 19
RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer, filed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Lawlor, Rebecca) (aje).
September 25, 2007 18
DECLARATION of John Fitzgerald in Support of 19 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer 13 by Plaintiff Veoh Networks, Inc.. (Lawlor, Rebecca) Modified on 9/27/2007 to link to document(aje).
September 7, 2007 16
PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Michael S Elkin appearing for Plaintiff Veoh Networks, Inc. Local Counsel Rebecca Lawlor Calkins. (aje)
August 20, 2007 9
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veoh Networks, Inc.. Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc. served on 8/13/2007, answer due 9/3/2007. (Lawlor, Rebecca)
August 13, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
Filed ORDER granting 3 Motion to file notice of party with financial interest under seal.. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/13/07. (cmy)
August 9, 2007 2
Summons Issued. (jmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veoh Networks, Inc. v. UMG Recordings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veoh Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Lawlor Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Glatstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Glatstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Glatstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Songs of Universal , Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Glatstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Represented By: Benjamin Glatstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin Glatstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?