Avila v. Scribner et al

Petitioner: David Avila
Respondent: L E Scribner and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2007cv01709
Filed: August 29, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED as modified herein. The Petition is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/6/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (av1).
February 19, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Supplemental REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Avila, 18 Order Adopting In Part and Rejecting In Part Report and Recommendation. The Court recommends Petitioner's due process claim based on del ay in his parole proceedings be DENIED. This final claim having been addressed, the Court further recommends the Petition now be DENIED in its entirety. Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2009 Replies due by 3/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/19/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (jrl).
September 4, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Response to Petition: The Clerk shall serve a copy of the Petition and this Order upon the Attorney General of California and a copy of this Order to Petitioner. Respondents' Motion to Dismiss due 10/19/07. If Motion to Dismiss is filed, Petitioner's opposition due 11/13/07. If Motion to Dismiss is not filed, Respondents answer due 11/2/2007. Traverse due by 12/3/2007. Signed by Judge Nita L. Stormes on 9/4/2007. (copies to Attorney General and Petitioner sent)(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avila v. Scribner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L E Scribner
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?