Hoyt v. Career Systems Development et al

Plaintiff: Darlene Hoyt
Defendant: Career Systems Development, Monika Spinks, Eugene Harris and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv01733
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 176 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/22/2011. (knh) (jrl).
September 14, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Plaintiff did not establish by a preponderance of the evidence that she was an employee of Career Systems Development Corporation; and that the Plaintiff did not establish by a preponderance of the evidence that Career Systems Development Corporation terminated her contract in a manner that violated the terms of the contract.(knh)
July 1, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying: 125 Ex Parte Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel; Denying 130 Ex Parte Motion to Bifurcate Trial; denying 132 Ex Parte Supplemental Motion in Limine No. 1. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/30/2010. (knh)
May 3, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Granting in Part and Denying in Part Without Prejudice 100 Motion in Limine; Granting 101 Motion in Limine; Denying Without Prejudice 102 Motion in Limine; Granting in Part and Denying in Part Without Prejudice 103 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/3/2010. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoyt v. Career Systems Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Hoyt
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Career Systems Development
Represented By: Shauna Lee Michelle Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monika Spinks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?