McKenney v. Hernandez et al

Plaintiff: Joe L. McKenney, Jr.
Defendant: Robert J Hernandez, M.F. Stout, L.V. Tillman, G.E. Gasgonia and Richard G. Ramirez
Case Number: 3:2007cv01735
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting re 95 Report and Recommendation and denying 72 defendants' Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's eighth amended claim. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/15/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
November 15, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 53 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. The Court Grants Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. Defendants shall produce all documents submitted to the Court for an in camera review on or before December 8, 2010. All documents submitted to the Court for an in camera review, including declarations, are hereby filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 11/15/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
July 7, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 22 Report and Recommendation, and Granting In Part 19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint: Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim for excessive forc e is granted and the claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND as to Defendant Hernandez only; Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to safety is granted and the claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND as to Defendant Hernandez only; Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim for deprivation of outdoor recreation is DENIED; and Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs First Amendment claim for denial of meaningful access t o the courts is granted and the claim is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND as to Defendant Hernandez only. If Plaintiff chooses to amend the complaint, he must, no later than forty-five (45) days from the date this Order is "Filed," file a Second Amended Complaint which cures the deficiencies of pleading as stated in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/7/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (av1).
April 1, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as to Defendant Hernandez filed by Robert J Hernandez, Richard G. Ramirez, L.V. Tillman, M.F. Stout: Recommending: Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs exces sive force claim against Defendant Hernandez be GRANTED without leave to amend. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim of deliberate indifference to safety against Defendant Hernandez be GRANTED without leave to amend. Defenda nts Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim of denial of outdoor recreation against Defendant Hernandez be DENIED. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs access-to-the-courts claim against Defendant Hernandez be GRANTED with leave to amend. Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2009 Replies due by 5/11/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 4/1/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (jrl).
September 8, 2008 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Granting In Part 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend: Plaintiff is GRANTED forty five (45) days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a First Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading as stated in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/8/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenney v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe L. McKenney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.F. Stout
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.V. Tillman
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.E. Gasgonia
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Ramirez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?