Baker v. Schwarzenegger et al

Plaintiff: Arthur Baker
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, John Dovery, M E Bourland, W C Roberts, G Stratton, J Jimenez, R Hopper, J Crabtree, C Hughey, V Canada and S D Leapheart
Case Number: 3:2007cv01773
Filed: December 20, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants Williams, Jimenez, Hughey, Tamayo and Stratton's 37 Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56(c). Dfts Crabtree, Leapheart, Ganier and Canada are dismissed from action pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Clerk directed to enter judgment and closed the file. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/10/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (kaj).
February 6, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 31 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot Plaintiff's 31 Motion for a 60 Day Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/6/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)
December 20, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pla's 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Pla's Complaint is dismissed w/o prejudice. Secy of CA Dept of Corrections shall collect from Pla's prison trust acct the $350 balance of the filing fee by c ollecting monthly payments from acct in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month's income and forward payments to Clerk of Court each time acct amount in acct exceeds $10. Pla is granted 45 days leave from the date of this Order t o file a 1st Amended Complaint. Dfts not named and all claims not re-alleged in Amended Complaint will be deemed to have been waived. If Pla's Amended Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, it may be dismissed w/o fur ther leave to amend and may be counted as a "strike". Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/20/2007. Blank copy of Amended Complaint t/w this Order mailed to Pla. Copy of this Order mailed to James Tilton, Secy of CA Dept of Corrections. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dovery
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M E Bourland
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W C Roberts
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Stratton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Jimenez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hopper
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Crabtree
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Hughey
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Canada
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S D Leapheart
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?