People of the State of California et al v. Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: People of the State of California and The City of San Diego
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C., SFFP, L.P., Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D", Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines., Inc., Scott Martin and DOES 1 - 100
Case Number: 3:2007cv01883
Filed: September 26, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment (Declaration of Purpose)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2013 276 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER on Motions for Summary Judgment And to Exclude Expert Evidence; Granting 208 Motion to Exclude; Granting 202 , 206 , 213 , and 214 Motions for Summary Judgment; Denying as Moot 210 City's Motion for Partial Summary Judgm ent; Denying as Moot Motions to Exclude Expert Evidence 203 , 204 , 205 , 207 , 211 , 212 , 215 and 216 . The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate this action and enter judgment in favor of Kinder Morgan on all claims in the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/25/2013. (srm)
November 18, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Scope of Deposition Testimony. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs' PMK Deposition topics may address the events beginning on the precise date that Defendan ts took ownership of the MVT in 1998 forward; and Defendants' net worth. Plaintiffs' PMK Deposition topics shall not address Defendants' conduct at Defendants' other petroleum sites. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/18/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
June 24, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the City of San Diego's Fifth Cause of Action (Negligence). For the reasons stated herein, the Court denies Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the City's Fifth Cause of Action for Negligence. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/24/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
April 22, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 137 Objections to 2/3/2011 Order of the United States Magistrate Judge filed by People of the State of California, The City of San Diego. Based on the information stated herein, the Court overrules Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's February 3, 2011 Order. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/20/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
October 12, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Amended Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Disclosure of Information Related to Shell Oil Company's Attorney Marc R. Greenberg. By 10/26/2010, Plaintiffs shall produce to Defendants Working Group Privilege Log Document Numbers 104 and 113. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/12/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of California et al v. Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Represented By: Michael J Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of San Diego
Represented By: Michael J Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Michael S Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael S Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFFP, L.P.
Represented By: Michael S Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D"
Represented By: Michael S Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines., Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Martin
Represented By: Michael S Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 100
Represented By: Michael S Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?