Pacific Rollforming, LLC. v. Trakloc International, LLC. et al

Plaintiff: Pacific Rollforming, LLC.
Defendant: Trakloc International, LLC., Pandora Select Partners, L.P., Trakloc North America, LLC., David Jablow, Gary Nelson, Bert Tabor and Thomas Horst
Case Number: 3:2007cv01897
Filed: September 27, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Contra Costa
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion to Dismiss; denying 129 Motion to Strike ; denying 130 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 06/18/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 9, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 94 Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction and Exonerate Bond: The preliminary injunction issued on November 21, 2007 is DISSOLVED and the related bond is EXONERATED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/9/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(copy to financial)(mjj) (jrl).
September 1, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Order to Show Cause: Defendant Southeast Metals, Inc. was ordered no later than January 30, 2009 to show cause why its answer should not be stricken and default entered against it for failure to enter an appearance through counsel. To date, Southeast Metals, Inc. has not complied. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to STRIKE the answer and ENTER DEFAULT as to Southeast Metals, Inc. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/1/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (jrl).
January 15, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 76 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Request for approval is DENIED because Gibson Dunn is not counsel of record for Pandora in this case. Pandora is represented by Anthony Oslund Baer Louwagie & Ross P.A. (Anthony Oslund). Anthony Oslun d submitted a pro hac vice application. The pro hac vice application was denied because the designated local counsel was not local to this district. Accordingly, Gibson Dunn is not Pandoras counsel of record in this case. If Anthony Osland wishes to designate Wilson Petty as its local counsel, it may do so by resubmitting a pro hac vice application. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/15/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
September 8, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and denying in Part 30 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: Pacific is GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND. Should Pacific choose to amend, the second amended complaint must be filed no later than 21 calendar days after this order is stamp ed Filed. Any response to the second amended complaint must be filed no later than 10 calendar days after service. If Pacific chooses to not amend the complaint, Defendants answer to the remainder of the first amended complaint must be filed no later than 10 calendar days after what would be the due date for the second amended complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/8/2008. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Rollforming, LLC. v. Trakloc International, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Rollforming, LLC.
Represented By: Frederick C Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trakloc International, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandora Select Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trakloc North America, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jablow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Horst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?