Araiza v. San Diego City Of et al

Plaintiff: Sergio Araiza
Defendant: San Diego City Of, Kelene Munro and Does
Case Number: 3:2007cv01921
Filed: October 1, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/13/09. (tkl)
February 6, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 joint Motion for dismissal in its entirety as to Defendant City of San Diego only. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/6/09. (tkl)
February 5, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 joint Motion to Continue hearing date of motion for summary judgment or in the alternative partial summary judgment without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/5/09. Modified on 2/5/2009 to edit text (tkl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Araiza v. San Diego City Of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Araiza
Represented By: Alvin Mark Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego City Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelene Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?