Gonzalez et al v. Compass Vision Inc et al

Plaintiff: Magda Gonzalez, Karen Hartson, Shawna Madison, Carrie Neill, Amy Shank, Amy Stokes, Shanda Turnidge, Bairbre Walsh and Denise Westfahl
Defendant: Compass Vision Inc, National Medical Services Inc, Quest Diagnostics Inc and Labone Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv01951
Filed: October 5, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Bernadino
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting 346 Third-party Defendant Maximus Inc.'s Motion to Reopen Action and Enforce Stipulated Settlement; and (2) granting in part and denying in part Maximus's Request for Attorney's Fees. Judgment is in favor ofMaximus and against Compass in the amount of $308,855.75. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/25/13. (cge)
November 4, 2010 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 260 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All further proceedings in the consolidated action shall be docketed under Gonzalez v. Compass Vision, 07cv1951-BEN(AJB). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/3/2010. (knh)
October 5, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (180) Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting (181) Motion to Seal; Granting (202) Motion to Seal in case 3:07-cv-01951-BEN -AJB; Granting (138) Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting (139) Motion to Seal; Granting (151) Motion to Seal in case 3:08-cv-01684-BEN -AJB. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/5/2010. (knh)
September 27, 2010 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Granting the Parties Motions to Seal - denying (103) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (139) Motion to Seal; denying (170) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (172) Motion for Summa ry Judgment; denying (176) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (178) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (189) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (223) Motion to Seal; granting (244) Motion to Seal Document in case 3:07-cv-01951-BEN -AJB; denyin g (64) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (107) Motion to Seal; denying (134) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (136) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (162) Motion to Seal in case 3:08-cv-01684-BEN -AJB. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/27/2010. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. Compass Vision Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magda Gonzalez
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Hartson
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Madison
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Neill
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Shank
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Stokes
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanda Turnidge
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bairbre Walsh
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Westfahl
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Vision Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labone Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?