Lucent Technologies, Inc. et al v. Gateway, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation and Lucent Technologies, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Lucent Technologies, Inc. and Microsoft Corporation
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corporation and Lucent Technologies, Inc.
Intervenor: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv02000
Filed: October 16, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2011 1478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Microsoft's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and in the Alternative, a New Trial with a Remittitur (Doc. Nos. 1432 , 1433 , 1434 ). The Court enters a final judgment in Lucents favor, inclusive of costs and pre-judgment interest, in the amount of $40,995,486.67. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/10/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
July 13, 2011 1323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1302 Defendant Microsoft's Motion in Limine Concerning Sims' Supplemental Expert Report. The Court grants the motion in limine to exclude Lucents Supplemental Exhibit 5.1, but reserves the right to revisit the ruling. The Court also grants the motion in limine to exclude Lucents alternative analysis of damages. The Court denies the motion to exclude the business realities approach without prejudice to any contemporaneous objections at trial and subject to any post-trial motions. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/13/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
February 25, 2011 1186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying in Part and Granting in Part Microsoft's Motion to Redact; (2) Denying in Part and Granting in Part Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Microsoft's Motion to Redact; and (3) Denying in Part and Granting in Part Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Microsoft's Reply to Motion to Redact. The parties are directed to meet and confer to determine if the motion and reply contain information that require redaction pursuant to this order. If necessary, the parties are to submit redactions of Microsoft's motion and reply on or before March 4, 2011. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucent Technologies, Inc. et al v. Gateway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Lucent Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Appleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Alan D Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Alan D Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Lucent Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth T Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Francis Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Alan D Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucent Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Appleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?