Waters v. Advent Product Development Inc et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Waters
Defendant: Advent Product Development Inc, Denise Thurlow, Alphonso Eiland and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv02089
Filed: October 31, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court Grants Judgment in favor of Matthew Waters and against Advent Product Development, Inc., in the amount of $23,430; Judgment in favor of James Holston and against Advent Product Development, Inc., in the amount of $23,430; Judgment in favor of William Marrs and against Advent Product Development, Inc., in the amount of $14,190; Judgment in favor of Arthur Garcia and against Advent Product Development, Inc., in the amount of $23,430; Judgment in favor of Dennis McCormick and against Advent Product Development, Inc., in the amount of $23,430; and Judgment in favor of Veronica Jack and against Advent Product Development, Inc., in the amount of $23,430. (ecs)
February 22, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 87 Motion for Class Certification. The Court appoints the named Plaintiffs as class representatives and appoints Sullivan & Christiani LLP as class counsel. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/22/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)(jrd).
May 19, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Entry of Default. Defendant did not appear at the OSC hearing on May 18, 2010. Default is entered against Advent Product Development, Inc. Prior to June 21, 2010, Defendant may file a notice of appearance and may seek to vacate the entry of default. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/19/10. (Copy of order to Advent Product Development, Inc., 742 Mink Avenue #11, Murrells Inlet, SC 29576)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Advent Product Development Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Waters
Represented By: William B Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advent Product Development Inc
Represented By: Mark A Krasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Thurlow
Represented By: Mark A Krasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphonso Eiland
Represented By: Mark A Krasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?