United National Maintenance, Inc. v. San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc

Plaintiff: United National Maintenance, Inc.
Defendant: San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv02172
Filed: November 13, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2013 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 273 Motion Re-Tax Costs; denying Plaintiff's Request to Deny Costs Entirely. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/2/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
September 5, 2012 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's [240-1] Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/5/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
July 24, 2012 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing and Oral Argument re 239 MOTION for New Trial MOTION for Judgment filed by San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc, 240 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Judgment filed by United National Maintenance, Inc., 240 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2012 at 2:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/24/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
February 18, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 136 Motion in Limine to exclude future damages theory and opinion testimony of Patrick Kennedy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/18/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
August 3, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment : The Court grants summary adjudication in favor of Defendant on Plaintiff's third, fourth, and seventh causes of action. The Court denies summary adju dication on Plaintiff's first, second, fifth, and sixth causes of action, and on Defendant's tenth and twenty-third affirmative defenses. To the extent not inconsistent with the above, the Court overrules both parties' evidentiary objections. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/2/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United National Maintenance, Inc. v. San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United National Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: Kristopher J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Convention Center Corporation, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?