Utility Consumers' Action Network et al v. Sprint Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Utility Consumers' Action Network and Eric Taylor
Defendant: Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint-Nextel Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv02231
Filed: November 21, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 4/7/10. (jvl)
October 28, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND CLASS NOTICE PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 10/28/09. (jvl)
August 7, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING DATES. Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. 69) is noted for consideration on September 18, 2009. Supplemental briefing is due on August 28, 2009. Responsive briefing is due on September 11, 2009. Replies are due on September 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 8/6/09. (jvl)
June 23, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION, re 69 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Eric Taylor, Utility Consumers' Action Network. Certification of a Nationwide Class is DENIED without prejudice to certification of a California class. Further briefing is ordered as described in this order. The Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. 69) is renoted for August 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 6/23/09. (jvl)
January 16, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER - WITHOUT PREJUDICE, denying 51 Motion for Protective Order.Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 1/16/09. (jvl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utility Consumers' Action Network et al v. Sprint Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utility Consumers' Action Network
Represented By: Alan McQuarrie Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Taylor
Represented By: Alan McQuarrie Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Spectrum L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint-Nextel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?