Terry v. Woodford et al

Plaintiff: William Terry
Defendant: Jean Woodford, Robert J Hernandez, J Ritter, Kinji L Hawthorne, Giannini, Choo and J Hunt
Case Number: 3:2007cv02360
Filed: December 17, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 ex parte application to Stay action for 90-day period. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/15/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
September 28, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss; Adopting in part and denying in part 20 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 09/28/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(bjb) (jrl).
July 6, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION to Dismiss is recommended to be GRANTED and MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint to be GRANTED in Part and DENIED in Part filed by Choo, J Hunt, J Ritter, Flores. Hernandez, McBride. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2009 Replies due no later than 10 days after being served with the Objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S. Porter on 07/06/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Woodford
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ritter
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinji L Hawthorne
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giannini
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choo
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Hunt
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?