Brown v. Poulos et al

Petitioner: David Carlton Brown
Respondent: M E Poulos and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2008cv00017
Filed: January 2, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED - that the court hereby adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. The court denies Petitionersrequest for reconsideration and for appointment of counsel(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (av1).
November 24, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2009. Replies due by 1/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jrl).
March 25, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for enlargement of time to file answer and to file lodgments. Respondent's Answer shall be filed by April 3, 2009. Petitioner may file a Traverse by May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/25/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)(jrl).
February 3, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/3/09. The court adopts as modified the R&R's recommendations 31 and orders Respondent's motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice to a renewed motion to dismiss addressing the merits of the petition 29 ; Petitioner's motion to stay and abey is denied 23 ; and Petitioners requests for counsel and an evidentiary hearing are denied 32 .(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Poulos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Carlton Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M E Poulos
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?