Soto v. Diakon Logistics (Delaware), Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Josue Soto
Defendant: Diakon Logistics (Delaware), Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv00033
Filed: January 4, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 220 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/4/2013. (sjt)
August 21, 2013 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 190 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class. Specifically, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs request to give their PAGA claim class treatment, and GRANTS the remainder of Plaintiffs motion in its entirety. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/21/2013. (sjt)
December 4, 2012 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 191 Plaintiff's Motion to Commence PAGA-Related Discovery. The Court will hold a telephonic Case Management Conference on December 13, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a JOINT discovery plan re: PAGA-related discovery shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge McCurines chambers Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 12/4/2012. (sjt)
August 10, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 118 Plaintiff's Motion for class certification and Denying as moot 153 Defendant's ex parte application for supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/10/2011. (mtb) (jrl).
August 30, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 84 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Without Prejudice; and Denying 111 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Supplemental Briefing: The time for Plaintiffs to file a motion to certify a class action is extended until September 20, 2010. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/30/2010. (mjj)
March 13, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 36 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Granting 41 Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim; Granting 45 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Third-Party Complaint; and Dismissing With Prejudice Amended Counterclaim and First Amended Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/13/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Diakon Logistics (Delaware), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Soto
Represented By: Derek J Emge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diakon Logistics (Delaware), Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C McNatt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?