Vallery v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Raynard Vallery
Defendant: Mail Room Staff, J Brown, -, Dee, D W Bell, G Stratton, M E Bourland and K J Allen
Case Number: 3:2008cv00095
Filed: January 16, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Discovery Orders and denying his 128 Motion to postpone Summary Judgement proceedings. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/14/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
November 23, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 110 Motion for Discovery-related relief. The Defendants are to serve Vallery with supplemental responses to document requests, and, where appropriate, include statements under oath no late r than December 2, 2011. (Motion hearing set for 1/9/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks.) Plaintiff may file a comprehensive supplemental opposition by December 15, 2011. The Defendants may reply to Vallery's Opposition (ECF No. 79 ) and any supplemental opposition by December 30, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 11/23/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
October 7, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Doc. 69 Motion to Compel Disclosure and Cooperation in Discovery. Motion Hearing for Summary Judgment is currently set for 11/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Reply due by 11/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/6/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 23, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 6/23/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vallery v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mail Room Staff
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Brown, -
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D W Bell
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Stratton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M E Bourland
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K J Allen
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynard Vallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?