Johnson v. State of California et al

Petitioner: Marvin L Johnson
Respondent: State of California, Schwarzenegger, . and Bill Lockyer
Case Number: 3:2008cv00115
Filed: January 18, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Report and Recommendation; Construing Petitioner's Untimely Filing as Objection to Report and Recommendation; Adopting re 9 Report and Recommendations: and Granting 6 Motion to Dismiss: Petitioner's objections are OVERRULED and Petition is DENYED as untimely. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/8/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
March 27, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Reopening Case and Setting Briefing Schedule; and Sua Sponte Substituting Respondents. Motion to Dismiss due 5/30/2008 Opposition to Motion due 6/30/2008 OR, Response/Return by Respondent due 6/16/2008,Traverse by Petitioner due 7/16/2008. James E Tilton rep by Attorney General added. Edwardo S Alamedia, Jr and Edmand G Brown terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 3/27/2008. (AG and Petitioner sent copies of Order)(mjj)
January 25, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE: The Court DISMISSES the Petition without prejudice due to Petitioners failure to name a proper respondent. To have this case reopened, Petitioner must file a First Amended Petition no later than March 24, 2008 in conformance with this Order. The Clerk of Court shall send Petitioner a blank Southern District of California habeas petition form along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/25/2008. (petition form and order mailed)(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Schwarzenegger, .
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?