Eggers v. Campagnolo North America Inc et al

Plaintiff: Mitchell Eggers
Defendant: Campagnolo North America Inc, B&L Bike and Sports Inc and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv00198
Filed: February 1, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 joint Motion to continue date for exchange of expert witness reports and discovery cut-off. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 4/30/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
April 16, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of dismissal 48 . It is ordered that Defendant Campagnolo North America, Inc. is dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/16/09. (tkl) (jrl).
February 18, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER denying 40 parties' joint Motion seeking to continue the deadline for exchange of experts reports to 7/27/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 2/18/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
February 9, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion to transfer 26 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/9/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). Modified on 2/9/2009 to include document no. 26 (tkl).
January 29, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/29/09. The court grants Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file First Amended Complaint to add Campagnolo S.r.l. as a defendant to this action. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (Additional attachment(s) (document image added on 1/30/2009: # 1 Main Document) (tkl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eggers v. Campagnolo North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Eggers
Represented By: Kevin R Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campagnolo North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&L Bike and Sports Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?