Kashani v. Adams et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Kashani
Defendant: Tyler Adams and Paul Phipps
Case Number: 3:2008cv00268
Filed: February 13, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - 1. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Matthew Kashani against defendant Donald Chaffee for conversion and fraud in the amount of $49,000.2. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Matthew Kashani against defendan ts Donald Chaffee and Tyler Adams jointly and severally for fraud- fraudulent use of personal and business identifying information for personal gain in the amount of $161,035.88. 3. Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff Matthew Kashani again st defendants Donald Chaffee, Bonnie Chaffee, and Tyler Adams jointly and severally for fraud- fraudulent use of personal and business identifying information for personal gain in the amount of $61,987.18. 4. Judgment is entered in favor of plai ntiff Matthew Kashani against defendants Bonnie Chaffee and Tyler Adams jointly and severally for fraud- fraudulent use of personal and business identifying information for personal gain in the amount of $177,184.23. 5. Judgment is entered in f avor of plaintiff Matthew Kashani against defendant Tyler Adams for fraud-fraudulent use of personal and business identifying information for personal gain in the amount of $1,883,479.07. 6. Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff Matthew Kash ani against Tyler Adams for conversion and fraud in the amount of $1,000. 7. Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff Matthew Kashani against defendant Tyler Adams for defamation in the amount of $200,000.00. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
March 8, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Request Motion To Place Settlement Conference Off Calendar. The date and time of the Settlement Conference on March 19, 2010 at 9:00 A.M. is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
November 30, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 joint Motion to voluntarily dismiss without prejudice as to defendant Paul Phipps only. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/30/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
September 11, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/11/09. The court grants plaintiff's partial motion for summary judgment as to liability on each of the four causes of action 72 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
September 8, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Plaintiff's ex parte Motion to Continue discovery deadline as to Third Party PC Mall, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/8/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
August 5, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Plaintiff's ex parte Motion to Continue the discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/4/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
June 16, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Defendant's ex parte application to continue scheduling dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/15/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
June 5, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Plaintiff's Ex parte Motion for leave to issue subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/5/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
April 21, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Plaintiff's ex parte Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's discovery order of March 5, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/21/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
March 5, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/4/09. The Court denies Plaintiffs ex parte motion for order to show cause as to Wells Fargo Bank, 20 and 1Source Data 19 . The Court denies Plaintiff's ex parte motion for issuance of order to release documents to Plaintiff as to Verizon Pennsylvania 30 . The Court also sua sponte quashes Plaintiff's document subpoena to PHB, Inc. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion to compel the production of documents as to Wells Fargo. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to compel as to 1Source Data as moot. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
February 27, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 defendant's ex parte motion to allow late filing of answer. The Clerk of Court shall file the Answer, attached as Exhibit 3 of his motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/27/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
January 12, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER scheduling motion on hearing date. The Court sets a motion hearing for issuance of order to show cause against Third Parties Wells Fargo Bank and 1Source Data 19 20 on February 27, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A. Third Parties Wells Fargo Bank and 1Source Data shall file an opposition by February 9, 2009. Plaintiff shall file a reply by February 17, 2009 20 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/12/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kashani v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Kashani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?