Fleming v. Coverstone

Plaintiff: Hoyt A. Fleming
Defendant: Tom Coverstone
Case Number: 3:2008cv00355
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2011 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 227 ) Motion For Sanctions and the (Doc. 231 ) Motion for Court's Review of Order Taxing Costs filed by Plaintiff Hoyt A. Fleming are denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/22/2011. (mdc)(jrd)
March 14, 2011 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's motions in limine numbers one, two, three, five, seven, eight, twelve, thirteen, fifteen, seventeen, and twenty (Doc. 153 ) are granted. Plaintiff's motion in limine (Doc. 153 ) number four is denied without prejudice t o object to specific evidence as it is presented at trial. Plaintiff's motion in limine number six is granted with regard to the law firm of Park, Vaughn and Fleming and denied in all other respects without prejudice to object to specific eviden ce as it is presented at trial. Plaintiff's motions in limine numbers nine, ten, and eleven are denied without prejudice to object to specific evidence as it is presented at trial. Plaintiff's motion in limine numbers fourteen and fifteen a re granted. Plaintiff's motion in limine number sixteen is denied without prejudice to object to specific evidence as it is presented at trial. Prior to referencing or eliciting evidence of Fleming v. Escort, Inc. and Beltronics USA, Inc. , CV-09-105-S-BLW, United States District Court, District of Idaho, a party shall bring the matter to the Court's attention outside the presence of the jury. Plaintiff's motion in limine number seventeen is granted. Plaintiff's motions in limine numbers eighteen and nineteen are denied without prejudice to object to specific evidence as it is presented at trial. Defendant's first motion in limine (Doc. 154 ) is denied without prejudice to object to specific evidence as it is presented at trial. Prior to referencing or eliciting evidence of a complaint filed in Texas state court, or any articles from the website www.law.com, a party shall bring the matter to the Court's attention outside the presence of the jury. Defendant's second motion in limine (Doc. 155 ) is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/14/2011. (mdc)
December 1, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Coverstone's (Doc. 150 ) Motion to Stay Trial is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/1/2010. (mdc)
August 16, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Park, Vaughan and Fleming's (Doc. 143 ) Motion for Leave to Amend Scheduling Order is granted. Park, Vaughan and Fleming's (Doc. 139 ) Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Park, Vaughan and Fleming's (Doc. 134 ) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is denied as moot. Fleming's (Doc. 135 ) Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/13/2010. (mdc)
November 19, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Defendant's Motion to Allow Coverstone an additional four hours to depose Hoyt Fleming. The continued deposition of Mr. Fleming for an additional four hours shall take place within 30 days of the issuance of this order and shall take place in San Diego, California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/19/09. (lao) (jrl).
June 25, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that the 1/22/2008 Email Exchange is a Valid Contract (Doc. 50 ), filed by Plaintiff Hoyt A. Fleming is denied. The Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. 56 ), filed by Counter-Defendant The resa A. Fleming is denied. The Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 425.16(c) (Doc. 51 ), filed by Defendant Tom Coverstone is granted. The Court awards Defendant Tom Coverstone $10,808.00 in attorney fees, which shall be paid within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/25/2009. (mdc)(jrl).
March 18, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Attorney Fees (Doc. 31 ) is granted. The Court awards Defendant Tom Coverstone $15,790.50 in attorney fees. The Motion to Strike Declaration of Gregor Hensrude in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc. 42 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/18/2009. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Coverstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoyt A. Fleming
Represented By: Steven F Schossberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Coverstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?