Haygood v. Knowles et al

Petitioner: Darrow Haygood
Respondent: Mike Knowles and Bill Lockyer
Case Number: 3:2008cv00374
Filed: April 7, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling Petitioner's objections; adopting 37 Report and Recommendation; and denying First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus in its entirety. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 09/08/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 25, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 20 Report and Recommendations; Overruling Petitioner's 22 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations; Denying 18 Motion for Stay and Abeyance; and Advising Petitioner of his Further Options for Proceedings in this Case: If Petitioner fails to choose one of these options listed in this Order by 10/30/09, this Court will dismiss the petition without prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz)(kaj).
January 26, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for order denying 13 motion to stay proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2009, Replies due by 3/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 01/26/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jpp)
March 5, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/5/2008. Court dismisses the Petition w/o prejudice for failure to 1.) pay the $5.00 filing fee or move for IFP, 2.) name a proper respondent, and 3.) submit application for writ of hab eas corpus on court-approved form. If Petitioner wishes to proceed w/ case, Petitioner must file First Amended Petition t/w copy of this Order and $5.00 filing fee or adequate proof of inability to pay fee by 4/29/2008. Case is closed. Blank copy of First Amended Petition and Motion for IFP t/w copy of this Order mailed to Petitioner. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haygood v. Knowles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrow Haygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Knowles
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?