Park v. CAS Enterprises, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joon Park
Defendant: CAS Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00385
Filed: February 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2010 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting in part 240 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Clark and Sommerfeld (2) Denying 222 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity of Claim 1 of the '373 Patent. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/10/10. (lao)
May 13, 2010 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Strike exhibits and related testimony (2) Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity of claim 1 of the '988 patent re 225 , 241 . Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/13/10. (lao)
April 8, 2010 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 227 Kreg Tool's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to produce documents related to Plaintiff's patent agent, Allen Dicke. The court, therefore, Grante Kreg Tool's motion and Orders that Mr. Adams produce thesubpoenaed documents to Kreg Tool's counsel no later than April 16, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/9/10. (lao)
March 18, 2010 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re objection to Magistrate Judge's Order awarding Defendant Attorney's fees. Plaintiff's objection is overruled. Plaintiff is ordered to remit $4,959.44 to Frank Farrell, F.S. Farrell LLC, by no later than March 31, 2010. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/18/10.(lao) (jrl).
January 4, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 148 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/4/10. (lao) (jrl).
December 18, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying Defendant's Motion for Stay of Discovery Order pending appeal; and (2) Granting Temporary Stay pending Motion for Stay filed with the Court of Appeals re 144 . Defendant shall file its motion to stay with the Federal Circuit by December 31, 2009, and file with this Court a status re stay and appeal by January 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/18/09. (lao) (av1).
November 19, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 121 Plaintiff's Rule 16(b) Motion to Amend scheduling Order for leave to Substitute designated damage expert. The court deems Chris Fogel to be Park's new damages expert. If Kreg Tool seeks to depose Mr. Fogel, the parties shall arrange for that deposition to occur by December 18, 2009, with each party to bear its own costs for the deposition. No later than December 7, 2009, Kreg Tool shall submit a declaration of fees and costs incurred for their taking the limited deposition of Gary Lande and for opposing and objecting to this motion. Park may file a response to that declaration no later than December 14, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/19/09. (lao) (jrl).
October 27, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel production of documents. Defendant's objections are overruled and Defendant is ordered to produce documents listed in Gro ups 2(a) and (b). Plaintiff's objections are overruled, except that Defendant is ordered to produce the following Group 2(c) documents: 189, 193-94, 205, and 239. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/27/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park v. CAS Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joon Park
Represented By: Paul E Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAS Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?