B.M. v. Encinitas Union School District

Plaintiff: B.M.
Defendant: Encinitas Union School District
Case Number: 3:2008cv00412
Filed: March 4, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/25/2013. (sjt)
May 15, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/11/2013. (sjt)
February 14, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming Decision and Directing Entry of Judgment. The Court hereby affirms the decision of the hearing officer and directs entry of judgment in defendants favor. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/14/2013.(sjt)
January 5, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Dismiss The Counterclaim (Doc. 17 ) And Granting Leave To File An Amended Counterclaim: B.M.'s motion to dismiss the counterclaim is GRANTED without prejudice. If counterclaimant intends to amend its counterclaim, it must do so within 10 calendar days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/5/2009. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.M. v. Encinitas Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.M.
Represented By: Jennifer Jean Kropke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encinitas Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?