Giles v. Thompson et al

Plaintiff: Ben Giles
Defendant: Justin Paul Thompson, Water Toys, Inc., Island Boat Rentals, KDME, Inc. and DOES I through L, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2008cv00439
Filed: March 10, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Marine Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Admiralty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 96 Ex Parte Application to Stay Dismissal. Plaintiff shall be given a 30-day extension to the stay of dismissal. However, no further extensions will be granted henceforth. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/7/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)(jrd)
August 30, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 74 Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Counsel of Record: Attorney Thomas Francis Feerick terminated as Counsel of Record for Defendant Water Toys, Inc. only. Defense counsel shall serve a copy of this order on Water Toys, Inc. by mo st expeditious means available and file a proof of service no later than September 7, 2010. No later than September 27, 2010 Water Toys, Inc. shall file a notice of appearance identifying its new counsel, including address and telephone number. The answer filed on behalf of Water Toys, Inc. may be stricken and default entered against it if it fails timely to comply with this order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/30/2010.(mjj)(jrl).
August 2, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 49 and 54 Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative for Summary Adjudication. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/2/2010. (mjj)
February 9, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing Date: Plaintiff's cross-motion, filed 2/7/09, was filed in violation of Civ. L. Rule 7.1. Plaintiff is hereby ADMONISHED that any further violations of Civil Local Rules or electronic filing policies and procedures may result in sanctions. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 27 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants' combined opposition due by 2/23/2009, Plaintiff'sReplies due by 3/2/2009. Motion Hearing set continued to 3/9/2009 10:30 AM before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/9/2009. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giles v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Giles
Represented By: Thomas F Friedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Paul Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water Toys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Boat Rentals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KDME, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I through L, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?