Jasso v. Hernandez

Petitioner: Rafael Jasso
Respondent: Robert Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2008cv00548
Filed: June 9, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/07/11.(jpp)(jrd)
April 4, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 37 Report and Recommendation, and Denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Based on the foregoing stated herein, it is hereby ordered that the Magistrate Judge's findings and conclusions are adopted in full, the instant petition is denied in its entirety, and the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 4/4/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 20, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 18 Petitioner's Motion to Stay and Abey; granting 18 Petitioner's Motion for Equitable Tolling of the Statute of Limitations. Answer to the Petition by 9/18/09. Traverse by October 9, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 8/20/09. (tkl) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jasso v. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rafael Jasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?