Pulse Engineering Inc v. Mascon Inc

Plaintiff: Pulse Engineering Inc
Defendant: Mascon Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00595
Filed: April 1, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 joint Motion to extend the discovery period and the deadline to file pretrial motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
May 27, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 joint Motion to extend Rule 26(a)(2)(B) expert witness written report exchange date to 6/8/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/27/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
March 11, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 ex parte motion to continue the Case Management Conference. The telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/11/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
February 3, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/3/09. The court denies Pulse's motion to exclude 23 and 25 . In addition, the court schedules a telephonic status conference for Monday, February 9, 2009 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
January 12, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 joint Motion to extend claim construction discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/12/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulse Engineering Inc v. Mascon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pulse Engineering Inc
Represented By: Iris Sockel Mitrakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mascon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?