RD Legal Funding, LLC v. Erwin & Balingit, LLP et al

Plaintiff: RD Legal Funding, LLC
Defendant: Erwin & Balingit, LLP, Darrell N. Erwin and Clarence M. Balingit
Case Number: 3:2008cv00597
Filed: April 1, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part (Doc. 55 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Interest, Attorney's Fees, and Costs. The Clerk is directed to amend (Doc. 54 ) the judgment for Plaintiff entered on April 29, 2010. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/10/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
April 8, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Partial Judgment: Because Plaintiffs Motion does not make the showing necessary for entry of a partial final judgment, the Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)
August 19, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Motion for Summary Adjudication of Claims Against Defendants Erwin & Balingit, LLP and Clarence M. Balingit. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/19/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (jrl).
April 4, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction: Plaintiff may amend the complaint to correct this pleading defect. Amended complaint due 4/21/08. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/4/2008. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RD Legal Funding, LLC v. Erwin & Balingit, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RD Legal Funding, LLC
Represented By: Tyler R. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erwin & Balingit, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell N. Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence M. Balingit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?