DR Systems, Inc. v. Eastman Kodak Company

Plaintiff: DR Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv00669
Filed: April 14, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2009 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 146 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; denying 147 Motion for Summary Judgment of a Finding of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,414,811 as Indefinite Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 112; denying 148 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; denying 149 Motion to Strike the Expert Report and Deposition Testimony of Jeffrey M. Silverman, MD; denying 151 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 186 Motion to Strike the 10/09/2009 declaration of Mr. Ferraro. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/09/2009. (ag)(jrl).
September 14, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 Motion for Protective Order; and granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 09/14/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ag) (jrl).
August 25, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages Under 35 U.S.C. § 287. The Courts ruling is without prejudice to Kodaks ability to seek reconsideration in the manner provided by law upon showing an earlier actual notice date or that no patented articles were sold. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 08/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ag) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DR Systems, Inc. v. Eastman Kodak Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Allison H Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?