Masterpiece Leaded Windows Corporation v. Joslin et al

Plaintiff: Masterpiece Leaded Windows Corporation
Defendant: Sonny J Joslin, James Tingey and Decor A Door and Window Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00765
Filed: April 28, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re dismissal 35 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to stipulation of the parties. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/23/09. (tkl) (av1).
September 1, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 dfts' Motion for additional discovery re interrogatories and request for admissions 29 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 9/1/09. (tkl)(jrl).
July 13, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 joint Motion to Continue discovery completion date, trial date and all other scheduled dates. Case Management Conference continued to September 15, 2009; Mandatory Settlement Conference continued to January 12, 2010 at 10:00 a.m.; Pre-Trial Conference continued to February 19, 2010 at 8:30 a.m.; Trial continued to March 22, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 7/13/09. Modified text on 7/14/2009 (tkl). (jrl).
May 22, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion to modify scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/22/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masterpiece Leaded Windows Corporation v. Joslin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masterpiece Leaded Windows Corporation
Represented By: Gastone Bebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny J Joslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tingey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decor A Door and Window Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?