Claver v. Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company

Plaintiff: Jason Claver
Defendant: Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv00817
Filed: May 6, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Partial Judgment Under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/8/2009. (mjj)(jrl).
June 1, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re oral argument. The court finds motion 17 to certify partial judgment for appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/1/09. (tkl) (jrl).
March 25, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: It is granted with respect to the first two causes of action for labor law violations, and denied with respect to the third cause of action. Plaintiff is granted LEAVE TO AMEND complaint with respect to the deficiencies discussed above. If Plaintiff chooses, he may add a cause of action for violation of California Labor Code Section 2802. The amended complaint, if any, shall be filed and served no later than 15 days after this order is stamped filed. Any response shall be filed and served as provided in Rule 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/25/2009. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claver v. Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Claver
Represented By: Brent Jex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?