Henslee v. Wilson et al

Plaintiff: Lance R Henslee
Defendant: C Wilson and V Sosa
Case Number: 3:2008cv01015
Filed: June 16, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. Court grants Dfts' motion to dismiss in its entirety. Case closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) \(av1).
August 17, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 35 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Court grants Dfts' motion to dismiss in its entirety. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/17/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (av1).
February 5, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 19 Motion to Dismiss. Court dismisses w/o prejudice Pla's 8th Amendment failure to protect claim and 8th Amendment excessive force claim. Court denies Dfts' motion to dismiss pla 's retaliation claim. Pla may amend his Complaint to cure the deficiencies w/in 28 days of the filing of this Order. If Pla chooses to amend, he must reallege all claims against all dfts or they will be waived. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/5/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henslee v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance R Henslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Wilson
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Sosa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?